Ton DIEPEVEEN
Constituencies
- Partij voor de Vrijheid Netherlands 2024/07/16 -
Groups
- Patriots for Europe Group Member Patriots for Europe Group 2024/07/16 -
Committees
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | 2024/07/19 | |
Member of | Committee on Fisheries | 2024/07/19 | |
Member of | Committee on Legal Affairs | 2024/07/19 |
Delegations
Contact
- [javascript protected email address]
Brussels
- Phone: 003222845587
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. WILLY BRANDT 07M115
- Full Address
- City: Bruxelles/Brussel
- Zip: B-1047
- Street: 60, rue Wiertz / Wiertzstraat 60
Strasbourg
- Phone: 0033388175587
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. LOUISE WEISS T03031
- Full Address
- City: Strasbourg
- Zip: CS 91024 - F-67070
- Street: 1, avenue du Président Robert Schuman
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
Amendments (1)By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
1 | 2024/0176(BUD) | 2025 general budget: all sections |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1957/08/27 - VeenendaalEducation (qualifications and diplomas)
- 01/09/1969-01/07/1973 : Ichthus College Veenendaal
- 01/09/1973-01/07/1976 : Christelijk Lyceum Veenendaal
- 01/01/1977-31/12/1977 : Rijkspolitieschool Apeldoorn, primaire politieopleiding
- 01/10/1983-01/12/1983 : Rechercheschool Zutphen
- 01/09/1989-31/12/1995 : Erasmus Universiteit Rotterdam, Nederlands recht
Professional career
- 01/01/1978-01/10/1982 : Wachtmeester Rijkspolitie, belast met algemene surveillancetaken
- 01/10/1982-01/10/1992 : Groepsrechercheur bij de Rijkspolitie
- 01/10/1992-01/07/1995 : Milieucoördinator Schouwen-Duiveland, provincie Zeeland
- 01/07/1995-30/09/1999 : Hoofd Bureau Handhaving bij de provincie Flevoland
- 01/10/1999-28/02/2002 : Senior consultant Ernst & Young Forensic Services
- 01/03/2002-01/03/2004 : Senior consultant SchaapBruinVanVliet
- 01/03/2004-01/07/2024 : Directeur-eigenaar advies- en onderzoeksbureau
- 15/01/2024-15/07/2024 : Beleidsmedewerker PVV-fractie Tweede Kamer
Political career
- 01/04/2019-01/04/2023 : Lid Provinciale Staten Gelderland namens de PVV
- 06/12/2023-25/09/2024 : Lid Provinciale Staten Gelderland namens de PVV, tevens fractievoorzitter
Honours
- Inhuldigingsmedaille 1980
Ton DIEPEVEEN on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2024-09-18Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
|
2024-08-21Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Brussels/Phone |
003222845587
|
Addresses/Strasbourg/Phone |
0033388175587
|
2024-08-06Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited |
|
2024-07-24Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Gender |
M
|
2024-07-24Show (1) Changes
Addresses/Brussels/Address/Office |
Old
07M015New
07M115 |